Penske automotive board of directors
WebThe registered office of PENSKE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. (the "Corporation") in Delaware shall be at 1209 Orange Street in the City of Wilmington, County of Kent, in ... within or without the State of Delaware, as the board of directors of the Corporation (the "Board of Directors") may from time to time designate or the business of the ... WebBoard of Directors Roger S. Penske Chair of the Board and CEO of Penske Automotive Group. Since May 1999, Mr. Penske has served as our... John D. Barr Retired Chairman, Papa Murphy’s Holdings, Inc.. Lisa Davis Former Chief Executive Officer Gas and Power and …
Penske automotive board of directors
Did you know?
WebAdministrative Assistant. Kelly. Oct 1993 - May 200511 years 8 months. Senior Vice President and GM- Global Sales/ Corporate Accounts (5/2003-4/2005) Senior Vice President and GM/ Metro Markets (4 ... WebPenske is the son of our Chief Executive Officer, Roger S. Penske. Individual experience: Extensive automotive retail industry experience; relationships with key automotive …
WebPenske Automotive Group. Gender Male. Investor Type Investment Partner. Mr. Kurnick, Jr. has served as our President since April 2008. From March 2006 to April 2008 he served as … WebBoard of Directors OFFICERS Jonathon Husby, Chair President & CEO, ADAC Automotive Ramzi Hermiz, Chair Emeritus KC Crain, 2nd Vice Chair President & COO, Crain …
WebPenske Automotive Group, Inc. _____ (Exact name of registrant as specified in its charter) Delaware 1-12297 22-3086739 _____ ... On October 28, 2010, the Board of Directors filled the vacancy created by Mr. Ishikawa’s resignation by appointing Yoshimi Namba as a director, as more fully discussed in the press release incorporated herein and ... Web17. feb 2024 · penske automotive group announces additional securities repurchase authority of $250 million pr newswire bloomfield hills, mich., feb... 14/04/2024 21:13:08 Cookie Policy +44 (0) 203 8794 460 Free Membership Login
WebPenske Automotive Group, Inc. (NYSE:PAG), an international automotive retailer, today announced that Sandra E. Pierce has been appointed to its Board of Directors. With this …
WebFrom July 2003 to January 2007, he served as our Executive Vice President — East Operations and from January 2001 to July 2003 he served as our President — Mid-Atlantic Region. Mr. Penske, Jr. serves as a member of the Board of Directors of Penske Corporation and is the son of our Chairman and Chief Executive Officer. ghostery gmbhWebPenske Automotive Group, Inc. (NYSE:PAG), an international transportation services company, today announced that Mr. Kanji Sasaki has been appointed to its Board of … ghostery glowWebRoger S Penske is Chair/CEO at Penske Automotive Group Inc. See Roger S Penske's compensation, career history, education, & memberships. ghostery for edge chromeWebPred 1 dňom · Roger Penske: Chairman & Chief Executive Officer: 85: 1999: Robert Kurnick: President & Director: 60: 2008: Michelle Hulgrave: Executive VP, Chief Financial & … ghostery for edge windows 10WebPenske Automotive Group, Inc. _____ (Exact name of registrant as specified in its charter) Delaware 1-12297 22-3086739 _____ ... On July 16, 2014, Yoshimi Namba resigned from our Board of Directors and as our Senior Vice President – International Business Development. On July 16, 2014, the Board of Directors filled the vacancy created by Mr ... ghostery for oneWebMr. Penske has served as the President, Chief Executive Officer and Chairman of SoCal Penske, a group of new car dealerships in Southern California, since 2008. He previously served as Penske Automotive Group’s President from January 2007 through March 2008. From July 2003 to January 2007, Mr. Penske, Jr., served as Penske Automotive Group ... ghostery glow private search extensionWeb13. dec 2024 · Penske Automotive Group, Inc. (NYSE: PAG), an international transportation services company, today announced that Mr. Masashi (Mik) Yamanaka has been … ghostery for silk browser